Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Frase, Allen, filed a(n) Workers Compensation - Labor and Employment case represented by Lawther, Jennifer, against Asplundh Tree Expert, Llc, Stephanie B. Mccloud, Administrator, Bwc, represented by Russell, Christopher, Zidar, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Summit County, OH, . Summit County, OH Superior Courts with MARY MARGARET ROWLANDS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMARY MARGARET ROWLANDS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2019 |
CategoryWorkers Compensation |
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSummit County, OH |
Matter TypeWorkers Compensation |
CIVIL COMPLAINT FILED
Date: September 09, 2019ANSWER AND DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT ASPLUNDH
Date: September 13, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | **CASE COSTED THRU 3/9/2020 FOR ORIGINAL COSTS. APPLIED PLTF DEPOSIT TO COSTS & REFUNDED BALANCE. COURT COSTS PAID IN FULL. JL | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE SETTLED AND DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE BY AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES. COSTS ARE TO BE PAID BY THE PLAINTIFF. MMR | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed JENNIFER L LAWTHER | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE ISSUED KIRSCHNER, DANIEL | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed COREY J KUZMA | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE ISSUED RUSSELL, CHRISTOPHER COE | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed CHRISTOPHER COE RUSSELL | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE ISSUED ZIDAR, MICHAEL J. | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE ISSUED KUZMA, COREY J | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed DANIEL KIRSCHNER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.