Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Third Federal Savings And Loan Assoc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Casterline, C. Scott, against Jackson, Anne, Jackson, Scott, in the jurisdiction of Summit County, OH, . Summit County, OH Superior Courts with CHRISTINE CROCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHRISTINE CROCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2017 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSummit County, OH |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT
Date: February 23, 2017PRECIPE FOR ALIAS ORDER OF SALE.
Date: May 11, 2018PRECIPE FOR ORDER OF SALE.
Date: October 27, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | **ORIGINAL ACTION COST PAID IN FULL. JL | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | **CASE COSTED THRU 9/25/18 FOR ORIGINAL COSTS. APPLIED PLTF DEPOSIT. BILLED PLTF ATTY CASTERLINE $1,003.32. JL | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed SCOTT C. JACKSON | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed C. SCOTT CASTERLINE | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed BRADLEY P TOMAN | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed ANNE M. JACKSON | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE ISSUED TOMAN, BRADLEY P | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE ISSUED CASTERLINE, C. SCOTT | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE ISSUED JACKSON, ANNE M. | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE ISSUED JACKSON, SCOTT C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.