Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Compan, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Drinan, Thomas, against Jackson, Scott, Jackson, Unknown Spouse Of Scott, State Of Ohio Department Of Taxation, represented by Conley, Craig, in the jurisdiction of Summit County, OH, . Summit County, OH Superior Courts with ALISON BREAUX presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeALISON BREAUX Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSummit County, OH |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
DEFENDANT SCOTT JACKSON AND ALLISON JACKSONS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT.
Date: December 14, 2015NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: July 22, 2016PLAINTIFF'S PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Date: February 12, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | This Case was transferred from Judge: MCKENNEY, TODD to Judge: BREAUX, ALISON Reason: LEFT OFFICE | |
January 26, 2017 | Docket Event | **CASE COSTED THRU 1/26/17. BILLED PLTF ATTY $134.92. AA ***PAID ON FULL ON 2/22/17 | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed CARRIE LYNN DAVIS | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SCOTT R. JACKSON | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed ANDREA SCHILD | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed MARK NATHANIEL DIERKS | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed CRAIG CONLEY | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed THOMAS MICHAEL DRINAN | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed STATE OF OHIO DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Regular Mail Service - Mailed ROBERT N. LURIE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.