Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Summa Health System, filed a(n) Money Due case represented by String, Kevin, against Jackson, Alexis, Jackson, Scott, represented by Semple, Neil, in the jurisdiction of Summit County, OH, . Summit County, OH Superior Courts with JOY M OLDFIELD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJOY M OLDFIELD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2012 |
CategoryMoney Due |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSummit County, OH |
|
DEFENDANT'S ALEXIS R JACKSON ANSWER TO COMPLAINT.
Date: October 31, 2012PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. TP
Date: December 19, 2012PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. COSTS TO PLAINTIFF.
Date: April 30, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2017 | Docket Event | This Case was transferred from Judge: PARKER, THOMAS to Judge: OLDFIELD, JOY | |
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Docket Entry: 58 NOTICE ISSUED TO SCOTT E JACKSON RETURNED MARKED UNABLE TO FORWARD | |
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. COSTS TO PLAINTIFF. | |
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE ISSUED JACKSON, SCOTT E. | |
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE ISSUED STRING, KEVIN L | |
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE ISSUED SEMPLE, NEIL MICHAEL | |
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event | SERVICE TO BE COMPLETE OR INDICATE THAT ATTEMPTS ARE BEING MADE WITHIN THE NEXT 30 DAYS SO CASE MAY PROCEED OR BE DISMISSED. TP | |
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE. | |
February 26, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTIFICATION OF FAILURE TO OBTAIN SERVICE SCOTT E. JACKSON | |
February 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Service - Not Delv. As Addr. SCOTT E. JACKSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.