Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Neumaier, Joshua C, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Saunders, Timothy R, Hartley, Aaron P, against Neumaier, Sara M, represented by Severt, Todd D, in the jurisdiction of Miami County. This case was filed in Miami County Superior Courts with Wall, Stacy M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWall, Stacy M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMiami County, OH |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Refund Payment To: Hartley Law Office Llc | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Refund Payment To: Lopez Severt & Pratt | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Fact Under Seal Of Court Judge: Wall, Stacy M Receipt: 171568 Date: 07/25/2022 | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Bar Association Notary Fees Judge: Wall, Stacy M Receipt: 171568 Date: 07/25/2022 | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Entry Issued Regular Mail To Joshua Neumaier, Sara Neumaier, Timothy Saunders and Todd Severt - basket | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Entry - Magistrates Order filed August 30, 2021 there being no motions for pretrial filed, dismisses without prejudice Applies To: Case Judge: Wall, Stacy M Receipt: 171568 Date: 07/25/2022 | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Of Substitution Of Counsel Filed With Certificate Of Service Applies To: Saunders, Timothy R (Attorney) on behalf of Neumaier, Joshua C (Plaintiff) | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Of Disqualification Of Aaron P. Hartley From Representation And Practice Of Law Filed with Certificate of Service Applies To: Saunders, Timothy R (Attorney) on behalf of Neumaier, Joshua C (Plaintiff) | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Magistrates Order Sent Regular Mail To Joshua Neumaier, Sara Neumaier, Aaron Hartley, placed in basket for Todd Severt Judge: Gee, Christopher M | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Magistrates Order Staying Proceedings Judge: Gee, Christopher M Receipt: 171568 Date: 07/25/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.