Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Phillips, Erin E, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Buch, Robert T, against Phillips, Kenneth Darwin, in the jurisdiction of Miami County. This case was filed in Miami County Superior Courts with Pratt, Jeannine N presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePratt, Jeannine N Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce Without Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMiami County, OH |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Vital Statistics Form Processed And Sent To State Of Ohio | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Refund Payment To: Mcculloch Felger Fite & Gutmann | |
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Regular Mail issued to Kenneth Darwin Phillips at 1250 S Dorset Rd., Room 227, Troy, OH 45373 returned - UNSERVED | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Violence Protection Fund Judge: Pratt, Jeannine N Receipt: 165633 Date: 12/02/2021 | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Fact Under Seal Of Court Judge: Pratt, Jeannine N Receipt: 165633 Date: 12/02/2021 | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Bar Association Notary Fees Judge: Pratt, Jeannine N Receipt: 165633 Date: 12/02/2021 | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Calling Action Judge: Pratt, Jeannine N Receipt: 165633 Date: 12/02/2021 | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment Decree Of Divorce Judge: Pratt, Jeannine N Receipt: 165633 Date: 12/02/2021 | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Magistrate's Order Memorandum Of Proceedings Filings required: Final Judgment and Decree of Divorce Judge: Pratt, Jeannine N Receipt: 165633 Date: 12/02/2021 | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Magistrates Decision Sent Regular Mail To Erin Phillips, Kenneth Phillips, placed in basket for Robert Buch Judge: Pratt, Jeannine N |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.