Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ball, Ii, Gregory S, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Geise, Steven J., against Ball, Angel R, in the jurisdiction of Miami County. This case was filed in Miami County Superior Courts with Pratt, Jeannine N presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePratt, Jeannine N Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 08, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMiami County, OH |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Refund Payment To: Kerrigan Boller & Link | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Refund Payment To: Geise Law Office Llc | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Fact Under Seal Of Court Judge: Pratt, Jeannine N Receipt: 170841 Date: 06/24/2022 | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Abstract To Bureau Of Vital Statistic Judge: Pratt, Jeannine N Receipt: 170841 Date: 06/24/2022 | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Calling Action Judge: Pratt, Jeannine N Receipt: 170841 Date: 06/24/2022 | |
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Family Violence Protection Fund Judge: Pratt, Jeannine N Receipt: 170841 Date: 06/24/2022 | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Vital Statistics Form Processed And Sent To State Of Ohio | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Decree Of Divorce with Children Judge: Pratt, Jeannine N Receipt: 170841 Date: 06/24/2022 | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Separation Agreement Filed Applies To: Ball, II, Gregory S (Plaintiff); Ball, Angel R (Defendant) | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Parties Sworn Acknowledgments And Waiver Of Magistrate's Decision Filed Applies To: Geise, Steven J. (Attorney) on behalf of Ball, II, Gregory S (Plaintiff); Link, Royce A (Attorney) on behalf of Ball, Angel R (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.