Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ramirez, Terri, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ramirez-Delacruz, Ariosto, in the jurisdiction of Miami County. This case was filed in Miami County Superior Courts with Wall, Stacy M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWall, Stacy M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 05, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce Without Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMiami County, OH |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Refund Payment To: Terri Ramirez | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Vital Statistics Form Processed And Sent To State Of Ohio | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Abstract To Bureau Of Vital Statistic Judge: Wall, Stacy M Receipt: 165642 Date: 12/02/2021 | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Fact Under Seal Of Court Judge: Wall, Stacy M Receipt: 165642 Date: 12/02/2021 | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Bar Association Notary Fees Judge: Wall, Stacy M Receipt: 165642 Date: 12/02/2021 | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Violence Protection Fund Judge: Wall, Stacy M Receipt: 165642 Date: 12/02/2021 | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Calling Action Judge: Wall, Stacy M Receipt: 165642 Date: 12/02/2021 | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Certified Copy of Judgment Entry Decree of Divorce Sent Regular Mail To Terri Ramirez and Ariosto Ramirez-Delacruz Receipt: 165642 Date: 12/02/2021 | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment Decree Of Divorce Applies To: Case Judge: Wall, Stacy M; Event Judge Gee, Christopher M Receipt: 165642 Date: 12/02/2021 | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Magistrate Decision and Judgment Entry Counsel for Plaintiff shall prepare a Judgment Decree of Divorce Judge: Wall, Stacy M Receipt: 165642 Date: 12/02/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.