Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Laughman, Tyler D, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Lopez, Jose M., Lopez, Jay M., against Laughman, Amy L, represented by Anderson, Jamie L., in the jurisdiction of Miami County. This case was filed in Miami County Superior Courts with Wall, Stacy M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWall, Stacy M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2022 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMiami County, OH |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Magistrates Order Sent Regular Mail To Tyler Laughman, Amy Laughman, Jamie Anderson, placed in basket for Jay Lopez Judge: Gee, Christopher M | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled for Judge: Gee, Christopher M Event: Pretrial Conference Date: 01/18/2023 Time: 02:30 PM | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Magistrate's Order Pretrial Conference set for January 18, 2023 @ 2:30 p.m. Judge: Gee, Christopher M | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Of Compliance Filed with Certificate Of Service Applies To: Lopez, Jay M. (Attorney) on behalf of Laughman, Tyler D (Plaintiff) | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | 90 Day Past Due Notifying Party Of Collections Laughman, Amy L was sent bill for $11.00 printed on 11/07/2022 Balance: $11.00 Past Due: $11.00 | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Sent To Ag Collection | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled: Judge: Gee, Christopher M Event: Telephone Attorneys Conference Date: 12/05/2022 Time: 10:00 AM Result: Further Pretrial Conference | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Magistrates Order Sent Regular Mail To Tyler Laughman, Amy Laughman, Jamie Anderson, placed in basket for Jay Lopez Judge: Gee, Christopher M | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Magistrate's Order Telephone Attorney's Conference set for December 5, 2022 @ 10:00 a.m. Judge: Gee, Christopher M | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Submission of Interrogatories and Request for Documents filed w/certificate of Service 10/21/2022 08:51 AM Attorney: Anderson, Jamie L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.