Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Trout, Nicole M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Fay, Roberta S., against Trout, Anthony W, in the jurisdiction of Miami County. This case was filed in Miami County Superior Courts with Pratt, Jeannine N presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePratt, Jeannine N Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 06, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMiami County, OH |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | 90 Day Past Due Notifying Party Of Collections Trout, Nicole M was sent bill for $305.75 printed on 05/03/2022 Balance: $305.75 Past Due: $305.75 | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Sent To Ag Collection | |
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event | 60 Day Past Due Notice Trout, Nicole M was sent bill for $305.75 printed on 03/28/2022 Balance: $305.75 Past Due: $305.75 | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | 60 Day Notice sent out on 12-16-2021 Returned marked unable to forward | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | 60 Day Past Due Notice Trout, Nicole M was sent bill for $305.75 printed on 02/09/2022 Balance: $305.75 Past Due: $305.75 | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Itemized Bill Trout, Nicole M was sent bill for $305.75 printed on 12/22/2021 | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | 60 Day Past Due Notice Trout, Nicole M was sent bill for $305.75 printed on 12/14/2021 Balance: $305.75 Past Due: $305.75 | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Magistrates Order Sent Regular Mail To Nicole Lenhart, Anthony Trout Judge: Parker, Janna L | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Magistrate's Order on Change of Address Judge: Parker, Janna L | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Of Change Of Address Filed (requested it be sealed) Applies To: Trout, Nicole M (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.