Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Miami County Treasurer, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Watkins, Paul M., against Heitkamp, James L, Ohio Department Of Medicaid, Unknown Heirs And Their Spouses Of James L Heitkamp, Unknown Occupants, Unknown Spouse Of James L Heitkamp, (total of 5) See All represented by Evans, Stanley R, in the jurisdiction of Miami County. This case was filed in Miami County Superior Courts with Wall, Stacy M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWall, Stacy M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2021 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMiami County, OH |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | NUNC PRO TUNC Entry Confirming Sale Ordering Deed And Distribution Judge: Wall, Stacy M | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment To: Detac-Prosecutor (Publication) | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Recorder Fees Receipt: 174595 Date: 12/06/2022 Receipt 174595 has been reapplied. Receipt: 174596 Date: 12/06/2022 Receipt 174596 has been reapplied. | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment To: Miami County Recorder | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment To: Aim Media Midwest | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Deposit Receipt: 174590 Date: 12/06/2022 | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment to: Realauction.com LLC | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment To: Detac-Prosecutor (Title Exam) | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED Entry Confirming Sale Ordering Deed And Distribution Judge: Wall, Stacy M Receipt: 174595 Date: 12/06/2022 Receipt 174595 has been reapplied. | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Fact Under Seal Of Court Receipt: 174595 Date: 12/06/2022 Receipt 174595 has been reapplied. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.