Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
State Of Ohio, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case represented by Joseph, Matthew C, against Line, Dustin E, represented by Fulker, Joseph W., Kollin, Thomas M., in the jurisdiction of Miami County. This case was filed in Miami County Superior Courts with Stacy M. Wall presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStacy M. Wall Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryNotice Of Appeal To Court Of Appeals |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationMiami County, OH |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Sent To Ag Collection | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Magistrate's Order "Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Brief" is STRICKEN. It appears that the motion was intended to be filed in Miami App. No. 2022-CA-24 | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Itemized Bill Line, Dustin E was sent bill for $109.50 printed on 05/25/2022 | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Calling Action | |
April 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Fact Under Seal Of Court | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Entry the judgment of the trial court is affirmed | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Certified Copy of Final Entry, Copy of Opinion, Issued to Judge Wall, Miami County Prosecutor by placing in inter-office box, mailed to attorney Thomas M Kollin | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Opinion Filed | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Sent To Dayton | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Brief Of Appellee State Of Ohio |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.