Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
State Of Ohio, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against Reardon, Michael D, represented by Garrett, Dawn S., in the jurisdiction of Miami County. This case was filed in Miami County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2021 |
CategoryNotice Of Appeal To Court Of Appeals |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationMiami County, OH |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion, Entry And Certification For Appointed Counsel Fees | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Itemized Bill Reardon, Michael D was sent bill for $137.50 printed on 04/01/2022 | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy of Decision and Entry Issued to Judge Wall, Prosecutor, by placing in inter office box, mailed to attorney Dawn S Garrett | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Decision And Entry the original judgment entry in Case No. 2021-CR-6 is reversed and vacated, and the case is remanded to the trial court. | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Response Of Appellee State Of Ohio | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Decision And Entry the State to respond to Reardon's application for reconsideration within ten days of the date of this entry | |
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Appellant's Motion Or Application For Reconsideration Filed Applies To: Garrett, Dawn S. (Attorney) on behalf of Reardon, Michael D (Defendant) | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Certified Copy Of Final Entry Issued to Prosecutor, Judge Wall By Placing In Inter-Office Box, Mailed To Attorney Dawn S Garrett | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Entry the judgment of the trial court in Case No. 21CR6 is also affirmed, however, the cause will be remanded for the sole purpose of vacating the nunc pro tunc entry. Costs to be paid as follows: 50% by Plaintiff-Appellee and 50% by Defendant-Appellant | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Opinion Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.