Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Medina County, OH, . Medina County, OH Superior Courts with Schafer, Julie A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSchafer, Julie A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2023 |
CategoryJ: Parentage |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMedina County, OH |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2028 | Docket Event | *** NO FURTHER PLEADINGS ON THIS CASE *** | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | 2nd Statement Postcard Def - DR | |
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event | 2nd Statement Postcard Plt - DR | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Cost Bill Issued for Def DR | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Cost Bill Issued for Plt on DR | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Appealable Order Sent to Attys/Parties via Ord Mail | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Entry Adopting Magistrate's Decision | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | 53(D) Notice sent to Attys/Parties via Ordinary Mail | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Magistrate's Decision | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk's Notice returned from USPS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.