Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) B: Marriage Termination No Children case in the jurisdiction of Medina County, OH, . Medina County, OH Superior Courts with Schafer, Julie A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSchafer, Julie A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2023 |
CategoryB: Marriage Termination No Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMedina County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | PLT Balance Paid In Full | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Cost Bill Issued for Plt on DR | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Appealable Order Sent to Attys/Parties via Ord Mail | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Notation | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Decree of Divorce | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Service Completed on | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Sent Return Receipt Requested | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | JE/Order Sent to Attys/Parties via Ordinary Mail | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Initial Disclosures |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.