Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
State Of Ohio Bureau Workers Comp, filed a(n) Civil Case (Converted Over) case represented by Jackson , Nathaniel, against New View Design And Remodelling Llc, in the jurisdiction of Medina County, OH, . Medina County, OH Superior Courts with Hutson, William F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHutson, William F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
CategoryCivil Case (Converted Over) |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMedina County, OH |
|
AFFIDAVIT ORDER & NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT
Date: January 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | 3rd Statement Postcard Plt - CV | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | 2nd Statement Postcard Plt - CV | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Cost Bill Issued for Plt Civil | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Substitution of Counsel | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Garnishment Hearing | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Service Completed on | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing Receipt | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Ordinary Mail Sent to Def(s) | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice to Judgment Debtor |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.