Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Huntington National Bank , The, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Toman , Bradley, against Belz , Amy, Belz , Brian, Medina County Treasurer, United States Of America, in the jurisdiction of Medina County, OH, . Medina County, OH Superior Courts with Hutson, William F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHutson, William F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2023 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMedina County, OH |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
`MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: January 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | PLT Balance Paid In Full | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Cost Bill Issued for Plt Civil | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal Entry | |
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Vacate | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication Filed | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Order of Sale Ret'd & Filed from Medina County Sheriff | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Order to Withdraw/Stay Sheriff's Sale | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Cancel Sheriff's Sale | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Online Auction Invoice | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Sale |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.