Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Case case against Williams , Tyesha, in the jurisdiction of Medina County, OH, . Medina County, OH Superior Courts with Kimbler, Joyce V. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKimbler, Joyce V. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Case |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMedina County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | 3rd Statement Postcard - CR | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion & Entry to Approve Counsel Fees Filed | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | 2nd Statement Postcard - CR | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Cost Bill Issued Criminal | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Change of Plea Hearing | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Written Plea of Guilty or No Contest | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Cert for Court Stenographer's Fees | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Change of Plea/Intervention Entry | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Subpoena(s) Returned - Good Service | |
February 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Subpoena(s) Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.