Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Zufall , Stephen, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Haude , Kristi, against Alkyer , Steven, Boyes , Eunice, Dennis , Adam, Hartzler , Tyson, Keller Williams Chervenic Realty, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Medina County, OH, . Medina County, OH Superior Courts with Hutson, William F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHutson, William F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMedina County, OH |
|
COMPLAINT FILED
Date: December 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Payment Plan | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Cost Bill Issued for Plt Civil | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Agreed Judgment Entry | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Deposition | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Partial Dismissal | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Copy of JE Sent via Reg. Mail to Atty's/Parties | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Substitution of Counsel | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Joint Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.