Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Anwar Saar, filed a(n) H732 - Beyond Jurisdiction- Oc- Taxed In Costs case represented by Pro Se, against Randy Vittoz, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County. This case was filed in Hamilton County Superior Courts with LESLIE GHIZ presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLESLIE GHIZ Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2023 |
CategoryH732 - Beyond Jurisdiction- Oc- Taxed In Costs |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHamilton County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERENCE DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Return | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO ANWAR SAAR AS TO UNDELIVERED SERVICE ON RANDY VITTOZ UNABLE TO FORWARD DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Return | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
ELECTRONIC POSTAL RECEIPT RETURNED, COPY OF BEYOND JURISDICTION DELIVERED TO CHRISTOPHER TRAVIS ON 03/30/23, FILED. [CERTIFIED MAIL NBR.: 7194 5168 6310 0984 7423] DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.