Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Scott Jolliffe, filed a(n) H706 - Other Civil & Jury Demand case represented by Allison Jon, against School Outfitters Llc, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County. This case was filed in Hamilton County Superior Courts with TERRY NESTOR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTERRY NESTOR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2023 |
CategoryH706 - Other Civil & Jury Demand |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHamilton County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT SCHOOL OUTFITTERS, LLC'S ANSWER DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | JURY DEMAND DEPOSIT BY GRAYDON SHAW RECEIPT NBR: 231000006184 | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTIFICATION FORM FILED. DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
ELECTRONIC POSTAL RECEIPT RETURNED, COPY OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT DELIVERED TO SCHOOL OUTFITTERS LLC ON 04/14/23, FILED. [CERTIFIED MAIL NBR.: 7194 5168 6310 0985 9761] DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE ISSUED TO SCHOOL OUTFITTERS LLC [CERTIFIED MAIL NBR.: 7194 5168 6310 0985 9761] | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO SCHOOL OUTFITTERS LLC DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON SCHOOL OUTFITTERS LLC DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ISSUE DESK - POSTAGE DEP. BY SUSAN HARTUNG RECEIPT NBR: 231000004588 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.