Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Sofi Lending Corp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Fitzgibbon Brittany, against Alandes Powell, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County. This case was filed in Hamilton County Superior Courts with ROBERT A GOERING presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROBERT A GOERING Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2023 |
CategoryH741 - Breach Of Contract- Oc |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHamilton County, OH |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Cost Statement | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | COSTS PAID BY AND CHECK ISSUED TO: BRITTANY FITZGIBBON | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Return | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
RETURN OF SERVICE BY PROCESS SERVER ON ALANDES POWELL ON 04/02/23 DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Return | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
ELECTRONIC POSTAL RECEIPT RETURNED, COPY OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT DELIVERED TO ALANDES POWELL ON 03/27/23, FILED. [CERTIFIED MAIL NBR.: 7194 5168 6310 0984 6211] DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGE ASSIGNED CASE ROLLED TO GOERING/ROBERT/A PRIMARY | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Written Request |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.