Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bertke Electric Company Inc Dba Bertke Electrical, filed a(n) H700 - Other Civil case represented by Lundrigan Nicole M, against Granite Guard Llc, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County. This case was filed in Hamilton County Superior Courts with JODY M LUEBBERS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJODY M LUEBBERS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 21, 2023 |
CategoryH700 - Other Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHamilton County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Cost Statement | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | COSTS PAID BY AND CHECK ISSUED TO: NICOLE M LUNDRIGAN | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Return | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
ELECTRONIC POSTAL RECEIPT RETURNED, COPY OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT DELIVERED TO GRANITE GUARD LLC ON 03/27/23, FILED. [CERTIFIED MAIL NBR.: 7194 5168 6310 0984 5764] DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGE ASSIGNED CASE ROLLED TO LUEBBERS/JODY/M PRIMARY | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE ISSUED TO GRANITE GUARD LLC [CERTIFIED MAIL NBR.: 7194 5168 6310 0984 5764] | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO GRANITE GUARD LLC DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.