Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Treasurer Hamilton County Ohio, Treasurer Of Hamilton County, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Ginocchio James S Jr, against 6488 Kellogg Llc An Ohio Limited Liability Company, Park National Bank, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County. This case was filed in Hamilton County Superior Courts with CHRISTOPHER A WAGNER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHRISTOPHER A WAGNER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
CategoryE520 - Foreclosure - Taxes |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHamilton County, OH |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO JAMES S GINOCCHIO JR AS TO UNDELIVERED SERVICE ON 6488 KELLOGG LLC AN OHIO LIMIT SERVICE TYPE: CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE REASON CODE: NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED [CERTIFIED MAIL NBR.: 7194 5168 6310 0984 4569] DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK FEES | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | MONEY RECEIVED & COST PAID BY CONRAD OPPT RECEIPT NBR: 233000001671 | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
ELECTRONIC POSTAL RECEIPT RETURNED, COPY OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT DELIVERED TO PARK NATIONAL BANK ON 03/23/23, FILED. [CERTIFIED MAIL NBR.: 7194 5168 6310 0984 4576] DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
ELECTRONIC POSTAL RECEIPT RETURNED, COPY OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT DELIVERED TO 6488 KELLOGG LLC AN OHIO LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON 03/23/23, FILED. [CERTIFIED MAIL NBR.: 7194 5168 6310 0984 4552] DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Return | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGE ASSIGNED CASE ROLLED TO WAGNER/CHRISTOPHER/A PRIMARY | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED BY CERTIFIED MAIL WITH WAIVER TO PARK NATIONAL BANK DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED BY CERTIFIED MAIL WITH WAIVER TO 6488 KELLOGG LLC AN OHIO LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.