Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Adair 0001, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Beyke Joseph L, against Jane Doe Unknown Spouse, Jane Doe Unknown Spouse If Any Of Ken Henize, Ken Henize, in the jurisdiction of Hamilton County. This case was filed in Hamilton County Superior Courts with WENDE C CROSS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWENDE C CROSS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 17, 2023 |
CategoryE541 - Foreclosure- Tax Certificate |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHamilton County, OH |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Cost Statement | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | COSTS PAID BY AND CHECK ISSUED TO: JOSEPH L BEYKE | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Return | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
ELECTRONIC POSTAL RECEIPT RETURNED, COPY OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT DELIVERED TO JANE DOE UNKNOWN SPOUSE IF ANY OF KEN HENIZE ON 04/17/23, FILED. [CERTIFIED MAIL NBR.: 7194 5168 6310 0984 2640] DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
ELECTRONIC POSTAL RECEIPT RETURNED, COPY OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT DELIVERED TO KEN HENIZE ON 04/17/23, FILED. [CERTIFIED MAIL NBR.: 7194 5168 6310 0984 2626] DOCUMENT MAY CONTAIN SENSITIVE INFORMATIONREDACTION MAY BE NEEDED |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO JOSEPH L BEYKE AS TO UNDELIVERED SERVICE ON JANE DOE UNKNOWN SPOUSE IF ANY 3/22, 3/31/23 LEFT NOTICE. UNABLE TO MAKE CONTACT. | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO JOSEPH L BEYKE AS TO UNDELIVERED SERVICE ON KEN HENIZE 3/22, 3/31/23 LEFT NOTICE. UNABLE TO MAKE CONTACT. | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Return |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.