Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County. This case was filed in Franklin County Superior Courts with JEFFREY M BROWN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJEFFREY M BROWN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedNovember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFranklin County, OH |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
COMPLAINT FILED
Date: March 18, 2022CASE SETTLED ENTRY TO FOLLOW
Date: April 17, 2023JURY DEMAND - DEFENDANT
Date: April 22, 2022NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITIONNAME:PHILLIP POWELLDATE - DEPOSITION:09/14/22
Date: October 19, 2022CONSENT TO MOVE OR PLEADNAME:OHIO INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATIONPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:D
Date: April 13, 2022MEMO CONTRA FILEDNAME:PHILLIP POWELLPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:P
Date: December 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT FILEDNO. OF DAYS:0000NO. OF ALTERNATES:00NO. OF JURORS:00NAME:PHILLIP POWELL
Date: December 05, 2022SUBPOENA RETURNED PROCESS SERVER - SERVEDNAME:JEFFREY KORNDATE - SERVICE:04/09/23
Date: April 11, 2023DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES
Date: May 12, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: March 22, 2022EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: November 22, 2022NOTICE
Date: December 15, 2022WITHDRAW PAPER FILINGTIE FILING DATE:10/21/22
Date: December 15, 2022DISMISSAL - AGREED ORDER
Date: May 01, 2023TERMINATE CASECASE NUMBER:22CV001725 SUPR CRT TERM CD:08
Date: May 01, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITIONNAME:JEFFREY KORN D.C.DATE - DEPOSITION:04/18/23
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBITS
Date: March 18, 2022JURY DEMAND - PLAINTIFF
Date: March 18, 2022CLERKS ORIGINAL CASE SCHEDULE FILED
Date: March 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | APPLIED - CLERKAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:27.00HOW PAID IND:N/AINTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:6511488PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:N | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT FOR FEES AND COSTSPAYEE NAME:PLYMALE & DINGUS LLCPAYEE ADDRESS:136 W MOUND STCOLUMBUS, OH 43215AMT- DISB/RFND:81.00MEMO AUTH NBR:6511488 | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | APPLIED - JURY FEESAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:25.00HOW PAID IND:N/AINTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:6511488PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:N | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | SUBSEQUENT COST BILLAMOUNT - PAID:225.00AMOUNT - FEES AND COSTS :144.00 | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL - AGREED ORDER | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | TERMINATE CASECASE NUMBER:22CV001725 SUPR CRT TERM CD:08 | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE SETTLED ENTRY TO FOLLOW | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED PROCESS SERVER - SERVEDNAME:JEFFREY KORNDATE - SERVICE:04/09/23 | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEPOSITIONNAME:JEFFREY KORN D.C.DATE - DEPOSITION:04/18/23 | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF HEARING NOTICE FILEDDATE - COURTROOM:04/03/23TIME - COURTROOM:10:30 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 4A345 SOUTH HIGH STREET4TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:JURY TRIALPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DATTORNEY NAME:W CHARLES CURLEYATTORNEY ADDRESS:WESTON HURD LLPSUITE 500101 EAST TOWN STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43215(614) 280-0200NOTICE PRINT DATE:02/02/23NOTICE MAIL DATE:02/02/23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.