Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Other Civil case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County. This case was filed in Franklin County Superior Courts with JEFFREY M BROWN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJEFFREY M BROWN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 11, 2022 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFranklin County, OH |
|
MOTION GRANTEDTIE FILING DATE:03/17/22
Date: March 21, 2022MAGISTRATE ORDER
Date: March 22, 2022COMPLAINT FILED
Date: March 11, 2022DISMISS AS TO CERTAIN PARTIES
Date: March 18, 2022CLERKS ORIGINAL CASE SCHEDULE FILED
Date: March 11, 2022MISCELLANEOUS PAPERCOVER PAGE
Date: March 15, 2022EXHIBITS
Date: March 11, 2022JURY DEMAND - PLAINTIFF
Date: March 11, 2022ENTRY
Date: March 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT FILEDNO. OF DAYS:0000NO. OF ALTERNATES:00NO. OF JURORS:00NAME:LINDA SHINN
Date: March 17, 2022MAGISTRATE ORDER
Date: March 25, 2022MAGISTRATE DECISION
Date: March 25, 2022EXHIBITS
Date: March 29, 2022SUBPOENA RETURNED ATTORNEY - SERVEDNAME:FIREWATER LIMITEDDATE - SERVICE:03/22/22
Date: March 25, 2022SUBPOENA RETURNED ATTORNEY - SERVEDNAME:MARK ROBERTSDATE - SERVICE:03/25/22
Date: March 25, 2022SUBPOENA RETURNED ATTORNEY - SERVEDNAME:JAMES YOUNGDATE - SERVICE:03/25/22
Date: March 25, 2022SUBPOENA RETURNED ATTORNEY - SERVEDNAME:KEVIN THOMASDATE - SERVICE:03/25/22
Date: March 25, 2022MOTION GRANTED IN PARTTIE FILING DATE:03/22/22
Date: March 25, 2022MOTION DENIED IN PARTTIE FILING DATE:03/22/22
Date: March 25, 2022NOTICE OF FILING
Date: March 30, 2022EXHIBITS
Date: March 30, 2022DEFENDANT DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES
Date: March 29, 2022PLAINTIFF DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES
Date: March 29, 2022JURY DEMAND - DEFENDANT
Date: March 28, 2022DECISION/ENTRY
Date: March 30, 2022SUBPOENA RETURNED ATTORNEY - SERVEDNAME:JONATHAN RYANDATE - SERVICE:03/25/22
Date: March 25, 2022EXHIBITS
Date: March 15, 2022NOTICEPAPER FILING WITHDRAWN
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBITS
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBITS
Date: September 30, 2023EXHIBITS
Date: September 18, 2023MEMO CONTRA FILEDNAME:DONALD CADEPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PMOTION TO FILE
Date: September 30, 2023EXHIBITS
Date: September 11, 2023REPLY TO
Date: October 17, 2023MEMO IN OPPOSITIONTO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL
Date: October 16, 2023ENTRY
Date: October 31, 2023REPLY TO
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBITS
Date: October 17, 2023WITHDRAW PAPER FILINGTIE FILING DATE:09/11/23
Date: November 02, 2023MAGISTRATE REPORT
Date: October 31, 2023MOTION DENIEDTIE FILING DATE:09/30/23
Date: October 31, 2023REPLY BRIEFNO. OF DAYS:0000NO. OF ALTERNATES:00NO. OF JURORS:00NAME:CITY OF COLUMBUS
Date: October 09, 2023MEMO IN OPPOSITIONMOTION FOR SHOW CAUSE ORDER
Date: October 16, 2023MOTION WITHDRAWNTIE FILING DATE:09/30/23
Date: November 02, 2023ENTRY
Date: November 02, 2023REPLY TO
Date: October 15, 2023MOTION WITHDRAWNTIE FILING DATE:09/18/23
Date: November 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAW PAPER FILINGTIE FILING DATE:09/11/23 | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION WITHDRAWNTIE FILING DATE:09/30/23 | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION WITHDRAWNTIE FILING DATE:09/18/23 | |
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY | |
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE REPORT | |
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION DENIEDTIE FILING DATE:09/30/23 | |
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS | |
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE ISSUED - CERTIFIED MAILNAME:JAMES YOUNGPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:NSERVICE ITEM DESC:PLEADINGCERTIFIED MAIL NO:522808489538ADDRESS:DESIGN AND CONST ADMIN COLUMBUS DEPT PUB SERV 109 N FRONT ST STE 3COLUMBUS, OH 43215ATTORNEY NAME:PHILLIP L HARMONATTORNEY ADDRESS:5312 LONGRIFLE RDWESTERVILLE, OH 43081-4468(614) 433-9502TIE FILING DATE:10/19/23 | |
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY TO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.