Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Other Civil case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County. This case was filed in Franklin County Superior Courts with JEFFREY M BROWN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJEFFREY M BROWN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 07, 2022 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFranklin County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT FOR FEES AND COSTSPAYEE NAME:HARRINGTON HOPPE & MITCHEPPAYEE ADDRESS:108 MAIN AVE SW STE 500 P.O. BOX 1510WARREN, OH 44482-1510AMT- DISB/RFND:108.00MEMO AUTH NBR:6469864 | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | APPLIED - CLERKAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:26.00HOW PAID IND:N/AINTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:6469864PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:N | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | SUBSEQUENT COST BILLAMOUNT - PAID:225.00AMOUNT - FEES AND COSTS :117.00 | |
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | STRIKE SCHEDULE DATETIE FILING DATE:03/07/22DATE - COURTROOM:03/06/23TIME - COURTROOM:09:30 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 4A345 SOUTH HIGH STREET4TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215 | |
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | STRIKE SCHEDULE DATETIE FILING DATE:03/07/22DATE - COURTROOM:04/03/23TIME - COURTROOM:10:30 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 4A345 SOUTH HIGH STREET4TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215 | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION IS MOOTTIE FILING DATE:07/19/22 | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION IS MOOTTIE FILING DATE:07/29/22 | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | TERMINATE CASECASE NUMBER:22CV001463 SUPR CRT TERM CD:08 | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMO IN OPPOSITIONTO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.