Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) Other Civil case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County. This case was filed in Franklin County Superior Courts with JEFFREY M BROWN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJEFFREY M BROWN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2022 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFranklin County, OH |
|
COMPLAINT FILED
Date: March 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | APPLIED - CLERKAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:9.00HOW PAID IND:N/AINTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:6538022PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:N | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | APPLIED - JURY FEESAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:25.00HOW PAID IND:N/AINTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:6538022PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:N | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT FOR FEES AND COSTSPAYEE NAME:BURDGE LAWAPAYEE ADDRESS:2299 MIAMISBURG CENTERVILDAYTON, OH 45459AMT- DISB/RFND:101.00MEMO AUTH NBR:6538022 | |
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | SUBSEQUENT COST BILLAMOUNT - PAID:225.00AMOUNT - FEES AND COSTS :124.00 | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | STRIKE SCHEDULE DATETIE FILING DATE:02/22/23DATE - COURTROOM:11/08/23TIME - COURTROOM:09:00 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 4A345 SOUTH HIGH STREET4TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215 | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | STRIKE SCHEDULE DATETIE FILING DATE:02/22/23DATE - COURTROOM:10/19/23TIME - COURTROOM:02:00 PMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 4A345 SOUTH HIGH STREET4TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215 | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | TERMINATE CASECASE NUMBER:22CV001374 SUPR CRT TERM CD:08 | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL BY PLAINTIFF | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE RETURNED - NOT SERVED | |
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE RETURNED - NOT SERVED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.