Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Workers Compensation - Labor and Employment case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County. This case was filed in Franklin County Superior Courts with CARL A AVENI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARL A AVENI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2018 |
CategoryWorkers Compensation |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationFranklin County, OH |
Matter TypeWorkers Compensation |
COMPLAINT FILED - CATEGORY D
Date: February 13, 2018NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Date: January 25, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | MASS TRANFER OF JUDGE LOCATIONOLD COURTROOM:COURTROOM 3FNEW COURTROOM:COURTROOM 6A | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | MASS TRANFER OF JUDGE LOCATIONOLD COURTROOM:COURTROOM 7BNEW COURTROOM:COURTROOM 3F | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | APPLIED - E-FILING CHARGEAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:2.00HOW PAID IND:N/AINTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:6278459PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:HOWARD G EADS | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT FOR FEES AND COSTSPAYEE NAME:BRICKER & ECKLER LLPWPAYEE ADDRESS:100 S 3RD STCOLUMBUS, OH 43215AMT- DISB/RFND:102.00MEMO AUTH NBR:6278459 | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | APPLIED - CLERKAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:40.00HOW PAID IND:N/AINTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:6278459PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PNAME:HOWARD G EADS | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | SUBSEQUENT COST BILLAMOUNT - PAID:225.00AMOUNT - FEES AND COSTS :123.00 | |
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL - AGREED ORDER | |
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | TERMINATE CASECASE NUMBER:18CV000819 SUPR CRT TERM CD:07 | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF HEARING NOTICE FILEDDATE - COURTROOM:05/24/19TIME - COURTROOM:08:30 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 7B345 SOUTH HIGH STREET7TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:MISCELLANEOUS HEARNGPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:DATTORNEY NAME:NICHOLAS W LANPHEARATTORNEY ADDRESS:ROSS BRITTAIN SCHONBERG CSUITE 3506480 ROCKSIDE WOODS BOULECLEVELAND, OH 44131(216) 447-1551NOTICE PRINT DATE:04/05/19NOTICE MAIL DATE:03/25/19 | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF HEARING NOTICE FILEDDATE - COURTROOM:05/24/19TIME - COURTROOM:08:30 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 7B345 SOUTH HIGH STREET7TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:MISCELLANEOUS HEARNGPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PATTORNEY NAME:THOMAS C TOOTLEATTORNEY ADDRESS:LAW OFC OF THOMAS TOOTLE 743 OAK STREETCOLUMBUS, OH 43205(614) 228-7747NOTICE PRINT DATE:04/05/19NOTICE MAIL DATE:03/25/19 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.