Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Franklin County. This case was filed in Franklin County Superior Courts with Karen Held Phipps presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKaren Held Phipps Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 06, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFranklin County, OH |
|
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION
Date: April 13, 2015COMPLAINT FILED
Date: March 06, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | APPLIED - CLERKAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:39.00HOW PAID IND:N/AINTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:6073942PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:N | |
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | APPLIED - E-FILING CHARGEAMOUNT - DEPOSIT:2.00HOW PAID IND:N/AINTRST BEARNG IND:NRECEIPT NUMBER:6073942PLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:N | |
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT FOR FEES AND COSTSPAYEE NAME:THOMAS & THOMASVPAYEE ADDRESS:2323 PARK AVENUECINCINNATI, OH 45206-2788AMT- DISB/RFND:104.00MEMO AUTH NBR:6073942 | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | SUBSEQUENT COST BILLAMOUNT - PAID:225.00AMOUNT - FEES AND COSTS :121.00 | |
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | STRIKE SCHEDULE DATETIE FILING DATE:06/07/16DATE - COURTROOM:10/24/16TIME - COURTROOM:09:00 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 7F345 SOUTH HIGH STREET7TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215 | |
September 23, 2016 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL - AGREED ORDER | |
September 23, 2016 | Docket Event | TERMINATE CASECASE NUMBER:15CV002027 SUPR CRT TERM CD:07 | |
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE RETURNED - NOT SERVED | |
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF HEARING NOTICE FILEDDATE - COURTROOM:10/24/16TIME - COURTROOM:09:00 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 7F345 SOUTH HIGH STREET7TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:TRIALPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PATTORNEY NAME:ERNEST V THOMAS IIIATTORNEY ADDRESS:ATTORNEY AT LAW2323 PARK AVENUECINCINNATI, OH 45206-2788(000) 000-0000NOTICE PRINT DATE:08/25/16NOTICE MAIL DATE:08/25/16 | |
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL COPY OF HEARING NOTICE FILEDDATE - COURTROOM:10/24/16TIME - COURTROOM:09:00 AMCOURTROOM LOCATN:COURTROOM 7F345 SOUTH HIGH STREET7TH FLOORCOLUMBUS, OH 43215HEARING TYPE DESC:TRIALPLNTIF/DEFNDT IND:PATTORNEY NAME:ANNE C LITTLEATTORNEY ADDRESS:WODA COOPER COMMUNITIES I10TH FL500 S FRONT STCOLUMBUS, OH 43215(614) 396-0027NOTICE PRINT DATE:08/25/16NOTICE MAIL DATE:08/25/16 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.