Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
King, Christina E, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Vaughn, Randy J, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County. This case was filed in Fairfield County Superior Courts with Smith, Laura presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSmith, Laura Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
CategoryEstablishment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFairfield County, OH |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | FAMILY FILE - GENETIC TESTING RESULTS | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
ISSUED SERVICE ISSUED COPIES CSEA CH BOX, CHRISTINA KING AND RANDY VAUGHN BY MAIL. |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE'S ORDER | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE BY PROCESS SERVER (PERSONAL) I RECEIVED THIS SUMMONS ON 2/8/23 AND MADE PERSONAL SERVICE OF IT UPON RANDY VAUGHN BY LOCATING HIM AND TENDERING A COPY OF SUMMONS AND ACCOMPANYING DOCUMENTS ON 2/9/23. | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT RETURNED ENDORSED Method : CERTIFIED MAIL FOURTH FLOOR Issued : 01/31/2023 Service : ISSUING PAPERWORK ASSOCIATED WITH CASE Served : Return : 02/13/2023 On : KING, CHRISTINA E Signed By : CHRISTINA KING Reason : RECEIPT RETURNED ENDORSED Comment : Tracking #: 9414726699042153709866 | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT RETURNED ENDORSED Method : CERTIFIED MAIL FOURTH FLOOR Issued : 01/31/2023 Service : ISSUING PAPERWORK ASSOCIATED WITH CASE Served : 02/03/2023 Return : 02/06/2023 On : HARLAN COUNTY CS ATTORNEY Signed By : STEVE VICINI Reason : RECEIPT RETURNED ENDORSED Comment : Tracking #: 9414726699042153709873 | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | PRECIPE FOR CHRISTINA E KING | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | PRECIPE FOR RANDY VAUGHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.