Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Whetstone, Douglas Brian filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County. This case was filed in Fairfield County Superior Courts with Smith, Laura presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSmith, Laura Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2023 |
CategoryDissolution Without Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFairfield County, OH |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT RECEIVED FROM SERENA WHETSTONE Receipt: 470962 Date: 04/05/2023 | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cost statement sent. Issued by Regular Mail. Cost statement sent. Issued by Regular Mail. WHETSTONE, SERENA PAIGE was sent bill for $33.50. Printed on 03/27/2023 11:53:06.61. |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL PAGE RECORD CHARGES Receipt: 470178 Date: 03/27/2023 Receipt: 470998 Date: 04/06/2023 | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
DECREE OF DISSOLUTION GRANTED. SEPARATION AGREEMENT ATTACHED JUDGMENT ENTRY/DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITHOUT CHILDREN GRANTED TO BOTH PARTIES WITH SEPARATION AGREEMENT ATTACHED ATTACHED. COURT COSTS ABOVE THE DEPOSIT SHALL BE PAID BY SERENA WHETSTONE. Receipt: 470178 Date: 03/27/2023 |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | VITAL STATISTICS ABSTRACT ISSUED TO HEALTH DEPT Receipt: 470178 Date: 03/27/2023 | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
ISSUED BY ORDINARY MAIL A COPY OF JUDGMENT ENTRY AND/OR ORDER THAT MAY BE A FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER U RULE 5 |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FOR A DISSOLUTION SET FOR FRIDAY, MARCH 24, 2023 AT 11:30 AM BEFORE JUDGE LAURA SMITH | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | FAMILY FILE - AFFIDAVIT OF PROPERTY | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | FAMILY FILE - AFFIDAVIT OF INCOME AND EXPENSES | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | PERSONAL IDENTIFIER FORM (THIS FORM IS NOT SUBJECT TO PUBLIC DISCLOSURE UNDER SUP.R. 45(D)(2)) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.