Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Easley-Smith, Amber, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Easley-Smith, Sr, Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County. This case was filed in Fairfield County Superior Courts with Smith, Laura presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSmith, Laura Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
CategoryDivorce Complaint With Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFairfield County, OH |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cost statement sent. Issued by Regular Mail. Cost statement sent. Issued by Regular Mail. EASLEY-SMITH, AMBER was sent bill for $275.50. Printed on 07/25/2023 09:09:23.48. |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | A-R NOTICE TO PAY COURT COSTS (NOTICE 1) EASLEY-SMITH, AMBER was sent notice for $275.50. Balance: $275.50 Past Due: $275.50 Printed on 07/25/2023 09:07:41.04. | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cost statement sent. Issued by Regular Mail. Cost statement sent. Issued by Regular Mail. EASLEY-SMITH, AMBER was sent bill for $275.50. Printed on 05/15/2023 14:43:09.34. |
|
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL PAGE RECORD CHARGES | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL Attorney: PRO SE (PROPER) | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
FOR SERVICE & MILEAGE RET FOR SERVICE & MILEAGE RET |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE(PERSONAL)- I RECEIVED THIS SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ON MARCH 24, 2023 AND MADE PERSONAL SERVICE OF IT UPON ANTHONY EASLEY-SMITH BY JASON LEWIS ON MARCH 24, 2023 | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | FAILURE OF SERVICE RETURNED-iSSUED NOTICE OF FAILURE Method : CERTIFIED MAIL FOURTH FLOOR Issued : 01/31/2023 Service : DOMESTIC SUMMONS Served : Return : 04/03/2023 On : EASLEY-SMITH SR, ANTHONY Signed By : Reason : UNSUCCESSFUL Comment : ISSUED BY CERTIFIED MAIL.. RETURN TO SENDER.. UNDELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED... UNABLE TO FORWARD Tracking #: 9414726699042153709897 | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT RETURNED ENDORSED Method : CERTIFIED MAIL FOURTH FLOOR Issued : 03/21/2023 Service : DOMESTIC SUMMONS Served : 03/24/2023 Return : 03/27/2023 On : EASLEY-SMITH SR, ANTHONY Signed By : CRYSTAL NORRIS Reason : RECEIPT RETURNED ENDORSED Comment : Tracking #: 9414726699042200958841 | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.