Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cremeans, Brenda, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bair, Joseph, Ewing, Hillary, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County. This case was filed in Fairfield County Superior Courts with Smith, Laura presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSmith, Laura Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2023 |
CategoryComplaint For Custody |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFairfield County, OH |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
ISSUED SERVICE ISSUED COPY TO ALL PARTIES BY MAIL AND CPS BY CH BOX |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE'S ORDER-A PRETRIAL SHALL COME BEFORE MAGISTRATE CLEARY ON JULY 17, 2023 AT 1:30 PM. | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE THAT A FULL HEARIING ON AN EMERGENCY ORDER DATED JANUARY 30, 2023 SHALL COME ON FOR HEARING BEFORE MAGISTRATE LORA CLEARY ON MONDAY, MAY 22, 2023 AT 2:00 PM | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE(PERSONAL)- I RECEIVED THIS SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ON FEBRUARY 27, 2023 AND MADE PERSONAL SERVICE OF IT UPON JOSEPH BAIR BY MARTY NORRIS ON MARCH 6, 2023 | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
FOR SERVICE & MILEAGE RET FOR SERVICE & MILEAGE RET |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR- REQUEST FOR SERVICE Attorney: PRO SE (PROPER) |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
ISSUED SERVICE ISSUED MOTION FOR CUSTODY, MOTION FOR EX PARTE, PARENTING AFF, NOTICE OF FILING, HEALTH AFF, AFF OF INCOME, ENTRY/MAG ORDER (FILED 1/26/23) AND CERTIFIED ORDER (FILED 1/30/23) UPON JOSEPH BAIR BY FAIRFIELD CO SHERIFF. |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
SERVICE FEE-FAIRFIELD Issue Date: 02/23/2023 Service: ISSUING PAPERWORK ASSOCIATED WITH CASE Method: FAIRFIELD COUNTY SHERIFF Cost Per: $0.00 BAIR, JOSEPH Tracking No: Z000023636 |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | FAILURE OF SERVICE RETURNED-iSSUED NOTICE OF FAILURE TO BRENDA CREMEANS FOR FAILURE UPON JOSEPH BAIR | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
FOR SERVICE & MILEAGE RET FOR SERVICE & MILEAGE RET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.