Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Noland, Karen, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Hopkins, Norman, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County. This case was filed in Fairfield County Superior Courts with TRIMMER, DAVID A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTRIMMER, DAVID A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2023 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFairfield County, OH |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
PRECIPE FOR
Date: January 26, 2023CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF PERSONAL SERVICE
Date: January 27, 2023SUMMONS
Date: January 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
DISCLOSURE OF DEFENDANTS DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS WITH PROOF OF SERVICE Attorney: COOPER, JAMES R (0023161) |
|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER CASE SCHEDULING ORDER AND HEARING NOTICE |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SUBMIT CONFERENCE REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FOR- CONSENT FOR TIME TO MOVE OR PLEAD Attorney: COOPER, JAMES R (0023161) |
|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM / CROSSCLAIM ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM OF DEFENDANT WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Attorney: COOPER, JAMES R (0023161) |
|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND CROSSCLAIM Attorney: COOPER, JAMES R (0023161) Receipt: 469106 Date: 03/10/2023 | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE FEE-LICKING | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE....MADE PERSONAL SERVICE UPON NORMAN HOPKINS BY LICKING COUNTY SHERIFF ON JANUARY 30, 2023. R THORP, SHERIFF | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF PERSONAL SERVICE CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF PERSONAL AND/OR RESIDENTIAL SERVICE......SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT WAS ISSUED TO NORMAN HOPKINS AT THE ADDRESS LISTED ON THE INSTRUCTIONS FOR PERSONAL AND/OR RESIDENTIAL BY LICKING COUNTY SHERIFF ON JANUARY 26, 2023 |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.