Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Darty, Andrew, filed a(n) Complaint For Custody case against Hicks, Marah, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County. This case was filed in Fairfield County Superior Courts with Smith, Laura presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSmith, Laura Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2021 |
CategoryComplaint For Custody |
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFairfield County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | REFUND: BALANCE OF DEPOSITS | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL PAGE RECORD CHARGES Receipt: 471423 Date: 04/12/2023 | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | REFUND: BALANCE OF DEPOSIT FOR SERVICE | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL/DISMISSAL Attorney: SOROKA, ROGER (0082195) |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRETRIAL HEARING IS SCHEDULED FOR TUESDAY JUNE 7, 2022 AT 8:30 AM | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
ENTRY NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY Receipt: 471423 Date: 04/12/2023 |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
ISSUED SERVICE ISSUED COPIES OF NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY IS SCHEDULED FOR ATTY JOSH BEDTELYON AND MARAH HICKS BOTH VIA ORDINARY MAIL |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE'S ORDER - PLAINTIFF DOES NOT ATTACH THE ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PATERNITY AFFIDAVIT OR ANY DOCUMENTATION FROM THE CENTRALIZED PATERNITY REGISTRY. THEREFORE, NO TEMPORARY ORDERS ARE ISSUED AT THIS TIME Receipt: 471423 Date: 04/12/2023 | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
ISSUED SERVICE ISSUED COPIES OF MAGISTRATES ORDER UPON ATTY JOSH BEDTELYON AND MARAH HICKS VIA ORDINARY MAIL |
|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON ORAL HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT FOR COUNTER AFFIDAVIT IS SCHEDULED FOR WEDNESDAY FEBRUARY 23, 2022 AT 9:00 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE SANDRA MILLER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.