Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Moorman-Williams, Imani Rose, Moorman, Alesia Rashawn, Fairfield County Csea, Fairfield County Department Of Job And Family Ser, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Williams, Rashid Muhammad, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County. This case was filed in Fairfield County Superior Courts with Smith, Laura presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSmith, Laura Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2021 |
CategoryEstablishment Of Paternity |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFairfield County, OH |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | FAILURE OF SERVICE RETURNED-iSSUED NOTICE OF FAILURE TO MELISSA GREENLEE UPON RASHID WILLIAMS BY CSEA PROCESS SERVER FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: APARTMENT BUILDING BURNED TO THE GROUND | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE BY PROCESS SERVER (FAILURE) I RECEIVED THIS SUMMONS ON 12/22/21 WITH INSTRUCTIONS TO MAKE PERSONAL SERVICE AND I WAS UNABLE TO SERVE A COPY OF THE SUMMONS FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: APARTMENT BUILDING BURNED TO GROUND | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | RECEIPT RETURNED ENDORSED Method : CERTIFIED MAIL FOURTH FLOOR Issued : 12/20/2021 Service : ISSUING PAPERWORK ASSOCIATED WITH CASE Served : 01/03/2022 Return : 01/06/2022 On : MOORMAN, ALESIA RASHAWN Signed By : ALESIA MOORMAN Reason : RECEIPT RETURNED ENDORSED Comment : Tracking #: 9414726699042153690294 | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | POSTAGE | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | FAMILY FILE - GENETIC TESTING RESULTS | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | PRECIPE FOR SUBPOENA Attorney: GREENLEE, MELISSA (0078812) | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | PRECIPE FOR SERVICE UPON BASHID MUHAMMAD WILLIAMS Attorney: GREENLEE, MELISSA (0078812) | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | PRECIPE FOR SERVICE UPON ALESIA RASHAWN MOORMAN Attorney: GREENLEE, MELISSA (0078812) | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED MAIL RESTRICTED DELIVERY COSTS Issue Date: 12/20/2021 Service: ISSUING PAPERWORK ASSOCIATED WITH CASE Method: CERTIFIED MAIL FOURTH FLOOR Cost Per: $10.00 MOORMAN, ALESIA RASHAWN Tracking No: 9414726699042153690294 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.