Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Money Judgment case against Mullins Aka Amber L Mullins, Amber, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County. This case was filed in Fairfield County Superior Courts with BERENS, RICHARD E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBERENS, RICHARD E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2021 |
CategoryMoney Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFairfield County, OH |
|
MONEY JUDGMENT
Date: December 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | REFUND: BALANCE OF DEPOSIT | |
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL PAGE RECORD CHARGES Receipt: 451493 Date: 05/03/2022 | |
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO AMBER MULLINS AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Attorney: MORRIS, MELISSA A (0072388) |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | FAILURE OF SERVICE RETURNED-iSSUED NOTICE OF FAILURE Method : CERTIFIED MAIL SECOND FLOOR Issued : 12/21/2021 Service : CIVIL SUMMONS Served : Return : 04/04/2022 On : MULLINS AKA AMBER L MULLINS, AMBER Signed By : Reason : UNSUCCESSFUL Comment : ISSUED BY CERTIFIED MAIL...RETURN TO SENDER...UNAB Tracking # : 9414726699042153779210 | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | FAILURE OF SERVICE RETURNED-iSSUED NOTICE OF FAILURE Method : CERTIFIED MAIL SECOND FLOOR Issued : 03/10/2022 Service : CIVIL SUMMONS Served : Return : 03/16/2022 On : MULLINS AKA AMBER L MULLINS, AMBER Signed By : Reason : UNSUCCESSFUL Comment : ISSUED BY CERTIFIED MAIL...RETURN TO SENDER...ATTE Tracking # : 9414726699042153719070 | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS Receipt: 451493 Date: 05/03/2022 | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
ISSUED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF CERTIFIED MAIL - COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT WAS RE-ISSUED TO AMBER MULLINS AKA AMBER L. MULLINS AT THE ADDRESS LISTED ON THE INSTRUCTIONS BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON MARCH 10, 2022. |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED MAIL DELIVERY COSTS Issue Date: 03/10/2022 Service: CIVIL SUMMONS Method: CERTIFIED MAIL SECOND FLOOR Cost Per: $10.00 MULLINS AKA AMBER L MULLINS, AMBER Tracking No: 9414726699042153719070 Receipt: 451493 Date: 05/03/2022 |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICE- Attorney: BROWN, ANNA V (0088667) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.