Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ohio Power Company, filed a(n) Complaint For Injunction case against Pfiefer, Damon, Tiger Distributing Co Llc, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County. This case was filed in Fairfield County Superior Courts with BERENS, RICHARD E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBERENS, RICHARD E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2021 |
CategoryComplaint For Injunction |
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFairfield County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT RECEIVED FOR COURT COSTS ON BEHALF OF OHIO POWER COMPANY PAYING $48.00 Attorney: CRABTREE, MOLLY S (0073823) Receipt: 454585 Date: 06/28/2022 | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Cost statement sent. Issued by Regular Mail. Cost statement sent. Issued by Regular Mail. OHIO POWER COMPANY was sent bill for $48.00. Printed on 06/13/2022 13:20:37.61. |
|
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL PAGE RECORD CHARGES Receipt: 453791 Date: 06/13/2022 Receipt: 457125 Date: 08/11/2022 | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Attorney: CRABTREE, MOLLY S (0073823) | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER AND ENTRY Receipt: 453791 Date: 06/13/2022 | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR JOINT SUBMISSION TO THE COURT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE AND FAX COVER SHEET Attorney: CRABTREE, MOLLY S (0073823) |
|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | FAILURE OF SERVICE RETURNED-iSSUED NOTICE OF FAILURE Method : CERTIFIED MAIL SECOND FLOOR Issued : 12/16/2021 Service : CIVIL SUMMONS Served : Return : 03/02/2022 On : PFIEFER, DAMON Signed By : Reason : UNSUCCESSFUL Comment : ISSUED BY CERTIFIED MAIL...RETURN TO SENDER...NO M Tracking # : 9414726699042153778954 | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | RECEIPT RETURNED ENDORSED Method : CERTIFIED MAIL SECOND FLOOR Issued : 01/06/2022 Service : CIVIL SUMMONS Served : 01/08/2022 Return : 01/14/2022 On : PFIEFER, DAMON Signed By : S K RIGGS Reason : RECEIPT RETURNED ENDORSED Comment : Tracking #: 9414726699042153712613 | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS Receipt: 453791 Date: 06/13/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.