Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Phillips, Brian, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Kuhner, Deborah J, in the jurisdiction of Fairfield County. This case was filed in Fairfield County Superior Courts with BERENS, RICHARD E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBERENS, RICHARD E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2021 |
CategoryComplaint For Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFairfield County, OH |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | FILING FEE REIMBURSEMENT CHECK ISSUED TO BRIAN PHILLIPS | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT RECEIVED Receipt: 470097 Date: 03/27/2023 | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | REFUND: BALANCE OF DEPOSIT | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cost statement sent. Issued by Regular Mail. Cost statement sent. Issued by Regular Mail. KUHNER, DEBORAH J was sent bill for $199.00. Printed on 03/10/2023 09:40:34.65. |
|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL PAGE RECORD CHARGES Receipt: 470258 Date: 03/28/2023 | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Receipt: 470258 Date: 03/28/2023 | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | FILING FEE REIMBURSEMENT Receipt: 470258 Date: 03/28/2023 | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULING ORDER SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR A JURY TRIAL TO BE HELD ON MARCH 28, 2023 AT 9:00 A.M. Receipt: 470258 Date: 03/28/2023 |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY REGARDING PARTIES' JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE Receipt: 470258 Date: 03/28/2023 | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO CONTINUE JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE Attorney: BENTON, SHANNON K (72418) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.