Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hu, Guanglin filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, OH, . Delaware County, OH Superior Courts with HEJMANOWSKI, DAVID A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHEJMANOWSKI, DAVID A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
Category(Pes) Estate |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Application for
Date: January 31, 2023Next of Kin
Date: January 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Application to Extend Administration Receipt: 94930 Date: 08/01/2023 | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry Entry Extending Administration | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Account Reminder Sent RICHARD M. SEILS JR, ESQ. Estate Account Reminder (N) Sent on: 07/06/2023 11:53:06.85 | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service of Account / Inventory and Notice of Hearing Certificate of Service of Inventory and Notice of Hearing Receipt: 93817 Date: 06/21/2023 |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Completed The following event: PROBATE NON-ORAL MAGISTRATE scheduled for 06/06/2023 at 8:30 am has been resulted as follows: Result: P Non Oral Completed Judge: Non Oral Location: Probate Courtroom | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry/Order Approving Inventory | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Waiver Notice of Hearing on Inventory Andrew Mao (Next of Kin); Receipt: 93700 Date: 06/15/2023 | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Cover Letter from Layne A. Ogden, Legal Assistant with Waiver of Ntice of Hearing and Consent To Inventory | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Consent to Power to Sell Real Estate Andrew Mao (Next of Kin); Receipt: 93132 Date: 05/24/2023 | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Cover Letter dated 5/18/23 with Consent To Sell Property |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.