Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Day, Olivia filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, OH, . Delaware County, OH Superior Courts with HEJMANOWSKI, DAVID A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHEJMANOWSKI, DAVID A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2023 |
Category(Ptr) Trust |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Record Check Authorization, Waiver, and Consent
Date: January 30, 2023Application for
Date: January 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry Granting Motion for Release of Assets to be Deposited with a Custodian in Lieu of Bond PC: William J. McLoughlin, Esq. | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Release of Assets to be Deposited with a Custodian in Lieu of Bond Attorney: MCLOUGHLIN, WILLIAM J (0034371) Receipt: 97418 Date: 10/26/2023 | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry Appointing Trustee PC: Kyle Stroh, Esq., William McLoughlin, Esq. | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters of Authority Receipt: 96931 Date: 10/09/2023 | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | The Trust | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry Order Accepting Resignation PC: Olivia Day, Kyle J. Stroh, Esq. | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Inventory Reminder Issued Inventory Past Due Issued |
|
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Inventory Reminder Issued PT Inventory Reminder (N) Sent on: 05/19/2023 10:30:08.49 | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry Entry Releasing Assets to be Deposited with Custodian in Lieu of Bond | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Release of Asssets to be Deposited with a Custodian in Lieu of Bond Attorney: STROH, KYLE J (0070771) Receipt: 91819 Date: 04/05/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.