Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bennett, Bernadine E filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, OH, . Delaware County, OH Superior Courts with HEJMANOWSKI, DAVID A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHEJMANOWSKI, DAVID A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2023 |
Category(Pes) Estate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Certificate of Waiver of Notice
Date: January 30, 2023Next of Kin
Date: January 30, 2023Application to Probate Will
Date: January 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Probate Case Closed | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Indigent Guardian Transfer Receipt: 90542 Date: 02/15/2023 | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | The docket | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Deposit Receipt: 90490 Date: 02/13/2023 | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry Approving Report of Distribution pc: Richard B Bennett, Pro Se | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Report of Distribution Receipt: 90504 Date: 02/14/2023 | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry Relieving Estate from Administration pc: Richard B Bennett, Pro Se | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Statement of Costs Sent To: Amount: $ Statement of Costs Sent To: Richard B Bennett Amount: $49.00 (Includes RoD) Probate Bill of Costs on Case (n) Sent on: 02/01/2023 15:01:27.28 |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry Admitting Will to Probate pc: Richard B Bennett, Pro Se | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry Setting Hearing pc: Richard B Bennett, Pro Se |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.