Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Young, Kaitlyn, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case represented by Hubble, Adam J, against Gatewood, Joseph, represented by Kaiser, Jo E, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with FULLER, RANDALL D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFULLER, RANDALL D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2023 |
Category(Dv) Domestic Violence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | FRANKLIN CO FOREIGN SHERIFFS RETURN - RECEIVED THIS WRIT ON 03/22/2023 AND SERVED JOSEPH GATEWOOD BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 03/22/2023 | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | FAX CONFIRMATION AMENDED NCIC FAXED TO DCSO | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | FAX CONFIRMATION 03/21 ORDER AND AMENDED NCIC FAXED TO DCSO | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE MAGISTRATES ORDER DOMESTIC VIOLENCE CIVIL PROTECTION ORDER FULL HEARING |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | FAX CONFIRMATION NCIC - SERVICE COMPLETED FAXED TO DCSO | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
MAGISTRATES ORDER STAYING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE CASE MAGISTRATES ORDER THE FULL CPO HEARING SHALL RECOMMENCE TO A DATE AND TIME OF FEBRUARY 21, 2023 AT 1:30 PM |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled The following event: DR DV CPO FULL HEARING scheduled for 02/08/2023 at 9:00 am has been rescheduled as follows: Event: DR DV CPO FULL HEARING Date: 02/21/2023 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: DISANTIS, SANDRA M Location: HEARING ROOM 3 - LEVEL 400 Result: DR TRIAL HEARD Result: DR TRIAL HEARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.