Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with David M. Gormley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid M. Gormley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL STALKING ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT BY LAW ENFORECEMENT ON THIS 31ST DAY OF JANUARY 2023 WE RECEIVED THE PETITION FOR CPO, CPO EXPARTE AND WARNING SIGNED BY DELAWARE COUNTY SHERIFF DEPUTY | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL STALKING FAX SENT / NCIC TO DELAWARE COUNTY SHERIFF | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL STALKING PROTECTION ORDER (CSPO) EXPARTE ORDER TERMINATION DATE: JANUARY 30, 2024 FULL HEARING DATE: FEBRUARY 13, 2023 AT 10:00 AM | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO SERVE TO THE DELAWARE COUNTY TO SERVE CPO AND FULL HEARING | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | STENO FEE The following event: Civil Protection Ex Parte Order Hearing scheduled for 01/31/2023 at 11:00 am has been resulted as follows: Result: Heard by Magistrate Judge: GORMLEY, DAVID M Location: COURTROOM 2 - LEVEL 500 | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL STALKING CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR CIVIL STALKING PROTECTION ORDER | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL STALKING CLASSIFICATION | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL STALKING INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.