Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed a(n) (Cv) Civil Common Pleas case represented by Goldstein, Jessica E, Moyer, Jackson T, Myers, Thomas R, against Urbanski, Nicole M, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with GORMLEY, DAVID M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGORMLEY, DAVID M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
Category(Cv) Civil Common Pleas |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
|
COMPLAINT/PETITION
Date: January 31, 2023SUMMONS & CTF COPY OF COMPLAINT TO
Date: January 31, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION
Date: April 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | COSTS PAID - NO RECORD | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT TO...................JACKSON T MOYER | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS UNTIL JULY 07 2023 Receipt: 312777 Date: 07/10/2023 | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | COPIES MADE & CHARGED TO CASE Receipt: 312777 Date: 07/10/2023 | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE ENVELOPE Sent on: 05/01/2023 10:06:13.28 Receipt: 312777 Date: 07/10/2023 | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Attorney: MOYER, JACKSON T (0081119) | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY OF SCHEDULING Receipt: 312777 Date: 07/10/2023 | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.