Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank Na, filed a(n) (Cv) Civil Common Pleas case represented by Goldstein, Jessica E, Moyer, Jackson T, Myers, Thomas R, against Cligrow, Mike D, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with SCHUCK, JAMES P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHUCK, JAMES P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2023 |
Category(Cv) Civil Common Pleas |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
|
COMPLAINT/PETITION
Date: January 30, 2023SUMMONS & CTF COPY OF COMPLAINT TO
Date: January 30, 2023NOTICE OF FAILURE OF SERVICE
Date: February 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | PRAECIPE TO TYPE AND FILE A CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT | |
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE | |
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | COSTS BILL | |
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | COST DUE - RECORD | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY AGAINST DEFENDANT MIKE D CLIGROW IN THE SUM OF $17,705.70 Receipt: 314745 Date: 08/30/2023 | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE COURT ORDER Sent on: 08/24/2023 14:39:58.06 Receipt: 314745 Date: 08/30/2023 | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL RECORD PAGES Receipt: 315568 Date: 09/25/2023 | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE Receipt: 314745 Date: 08/30/2023 | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | COPIES MADE & CHARGED TO CASE Receipt: 314745 Date: 08/30/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.