Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ratliff, Bradley J, filed a(n) (Cv) Civil Common Pleas case represented by Carwile, Tiffany L, Coe, Stefanie Lynn, against Hill, Joshua A, Hill, Samuel J, Kendle, Lisa E, Priority Mortgage Corp, Viola, Marianne M, (total of 5) See All represented by Lindenmbaum, Kyle, Painter, Nathan D, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with SCHUCK, JAMES P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHUCK, JAMES P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2023 |
Category(Cv) Civil Common Pleas |
Last RefreshedNovember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
|
COMPLAINT/PETITION
Date: January 23, 2023INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICE
Date: January 23, 2023CLASSIFICATION
Date: January 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY AND ORDER AMENDING CASE SCHEDULING ORDER | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION PARTIES JOINT MOTION TO AMEND THE CASE SCHEDULE (E-FILED) Attorney: LINDENMBAUM, KYLE (0093408) |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | COPIES OF E-FILING CHARGED TO CASE | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | COPIES OF E-FILING CHARGED TO CASE | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER REPLY OF PLAINTIFF / COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANT BRADLEY J RATLIFF TO DEFENDANTS / COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFFS S HILL, J HILL, L KENDLE, M VIOLA, AND PRIORITY MORTGAGE CORP Attorney: COE, STEFANIE LYNN (0078265) |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA TO BE SERVED UPON MIKE DULIA VIA ATTORNEY Attorney: LINDENMBAUM, KYLE (0093408) | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.