Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Delaware County Treasurer, filed a(n) (Cv) Civil Common Pleas case represented by Betts, Christopher D, against Alban, Cary, Alban, Glenna, Alban, Jerry Russell, Alban, Russell Whit, Alban, Thomas Arthur, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with SCHUCK, JAMES P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHUCK, JAMES P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
Category(Cv) Civil Common Pleas |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
|
COMPLAINT/PETITION
Date: January 31, 2023PRELIMINARY JUDICIAL REPORT
Date: January 31, 2023SUMMONS & CERTIFIED COPY OF COMPLAINT BY REGULAR MAIL
Date: February 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE FOR ORDER OF REAL AUCTION SALE WITHOUT REAPPRAISAL PRAECIPE FOR ORDER SHERIFF SALE Attorney: BETTS, CHRISTOPHER D (0068030) |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE Receipt: 313244 Date: 07/24/2023 Receipt # 313244 has been reapplied Receipt: 315896 Date: 10/03/2023 | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER Receipt: 313244 Date: 07/24/2023 Receipt # 313244 has been reapplied Receipt: 315896 Date: 10/03/2023 | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY JUDGMENT GRANTING DECREE OF FORECLOSURE Receipt: 313244 Date: 07/24/2023 Receipt # 313244 has been reapplied Receipt: 315896 Date: 10/03/2023 |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DECREE OF FORECLOSURE FILED ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT DELAWARE COUNTY TREASURER (E-FILED) Attorney: BETTS, CHRISTOPHER D (0068030) | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | COPIES OF E-FILING CHARGED TO CASE Attorney: BETTS, CHRISTOPHER D (0068030) Receipt: 313244 Date: 07/24/2023 Receipt # 313244 has been reapplied Receipt: 315896 Date: 10/03/2023 | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY GRANTING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT Receipt: 313244 Date: 07/24/2023 Receipt # 313244 has been reapplied Receipt: 315896 Date: 10/03/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.